CBSE Class 4 Mathematics-Practise Assignment. Students are advised to refer to the attached assignments and practise them regularly. This will help them to identify their weak areas and will help them to score better in examination. Parents should download and give the assignments to their children for practice.

Revision Worksheet-1

Q1. Fill in the blanks:

a) The number name of 67,895 is

__________________________________________

b) The numeral for sixty thousand eight hundred four

is

___________________________________________

c) The short form of 6,00,000 +5,000+ 400+2 is

__________________________________________

d) 78,934 ____ 78,943 (<,> or =)

e)The sum of place value and face value of 9 in

9,65,438 is

____________________________________

f) The expanded form of 87,956 is

_____________________________________

Q2.Identify the order (ascending or descending) for the

given set of numbers:

a)931713,862729,78625,63945___________________

b)559921,2367912,4363792,4456781______________

Q3.a) Count in thousands .

6,385;7,385;_______;________;_________;________

b)Count in ten thousands.

29,536;39,536; _______;________;_________;________

Q4. Use the digits to make the greatest number and the

smallest number possible. Do not repeat the digits.

i) 8,7,0,9,2 ________________;_____________

ii) 1,4,3,8,5,2______________;______________

iii) 2,8,1,4,0 ______________;______________

Q5 Use the digits to make the greatest number and the

smallest number possible. You may repeat the digits.

i) 2,9,1 _______________;________________

ii) 1,3,0,8 ______________;________________

Revision Worksheet-2

Topic: Addition and Subtraction

Name :______________ Class/sec: IV__

Q1.Fill in the blanks:

a)The numbers which are added are called ________

b) The number which is subtracted is called

___________

c) 864310 +1 =______________

d)1000 less than 75261is __________________

e)________ +0=147259

f) 78945 – 0 =____________

Q2.Write in columns and find the sum.

a)7125+3799 b) 25673+12396

___________________________________________

___________________________________________

___________________________________________

__________________________________________

b)45816+18005

___________________________________________

___________________________________________

___________________________________________

___________________________________________

___________________________________________

Q3.Write in columns and find the difference .

a)90000-41395 b)30500-12895

___________________________________________

___________________________________________

___________________________________________

___________________________________________

___________________________________________

___________________________________________

c17392-9356

_____________________________________________

_____________________________________________

_____________________________________________

_____________________________________________

_____________________________________________

__________________________________________

Q4. Subtract. Also check your answer.

a) 8496-1762 b ) 47653-23854

______________________________________________

______________________________________________

______________________________________________

______________________________________________

______________________________________________

______________________________________________

______________________________________________

______________________________________________

_____________________________________________

Q5. Round the numbers 387, 5869,89922 to the nearest

tens , hundreds and thousands.

______________________________________________

______________________________________________

______________________________________________

_____________________________________________

______________________________________________

Q6. The cost of three computers was Rs.40900,Rs.73675

and Rs.50480respectively.How much did they cost

altogether?

______________________________________________

______________________________________________

______________________________________________

_____________________________________________

______________________________________________

Q7.Mr. Atif family went on holidays ,they spent Rs3458

on petrol;Rs.3765 on food and Rs.2900 on stay.They

also spent Rs.1050 on sight seeing.Hoe much did their

holiday cost them?

______________________________________________

______________________________________________

______________________________________________

_____________________________________________

______________________________________________

Q8. The cost of a T.V set was Rs.35680 and for a C.D.

system was Rs.22840. How much more did the T.V. set

cost than the C.D.system?

______________________________________________

______________________________________________

______________________________________________

_____________________________________________

______________________________________________

Q9.Riyan had Rs26,.45,000 in his saving account. He

purchased a flat for Rs.20,70,000 and spent

Rs.3,20,500 in getting some additional work done on

the flat.How much does he still have in his account?

______________________________________________

______________________________________________

______________________________________________

_____________________________________________

______________________________________________

Revision Worksheet-3

Q1. Fill in theblanks.

i) In multiplication the number to be multiplied is

called ___________

ii) The number by which we multiply is called

____________

iii) 5679 x 0 = ______

iv) 4761 x _____=4761

v) 593 x _______=593000

vi) The number to be divided is called_______

vii) Dividend = (quotient x __________) + remainder

Q2. Multiply using column method.

i) 7954 x 18 ii)5670 x 203

_________________________________________

_________________________________________

_________________________________________

________________________________________

iii)2901 x 58

_________________________________________

_________________________________________

_________________________________________

_________________________________________

________________________________________

Q3. Multiply using expansion method.

i) 4562 x7 ii) 6532 x 5

_________________________________________

_________________________________________

_________________________________________

_________________________________________

_________________________________________

_________________________________________

Q4. Divide and check the answer.

i) 5278 ÷ 4 ii) 632 ÷ 15

_________________________________________

_________________________________________

_________________________________________

ii) 2514 ÷ 32

_________________________________________

_________________________________________

_________________________________________

_________________________________________

________________________________________

________________________________________

Q5.Solve using lattice method .

i) 125 x 12 ii)712 x 53

_________________________________________

_________________________________________

_________________________________________

_________________________________________

_______________________________________

________________________________________

Q6.Divide by

i) Drawing dots

a) 18 ÷ 6

b) 20 ÷ 5

ii) Using repeated subtraction

a) 36 ÷ 6 b) 49 ÷7

_______________________________________

_______________________________________

_______________________________________

_______________________________________

_______________________________________

_______________________________________

_______________________________________

_______________________________________

Q7.If one video- game costs Rs. 468. Find the cost of 73

video-games.

______________________________________________

______________________________________________

______________________________________________

______________________________________________

______________________________________________

_____________________________________________

Q8. 34 suitcases costs Rs.73720.Find the cost of each

suitcase?

______________________________________________

______________________________________________

Revision Worksheet-5

Q1.Draw the line segments by using a ruler.

a. 5cm4mm b. 7cm c.8cm4mm

Q2. Draw a circle with

a)Diameter=8cm

b)Radius= 5cm

Q3.Find the diameter of a circle whose radius is 4 cm.

______________________________________________

______________________________________________

______________________________________________

______________________________________________

______________________________________________

_____________________________________________

Q4.Draw and label all parts of

a. Cube

b.Cylinder

c. Cone

Q4.Find all the possible factors of :

a)

12_________________________________________

___________________________________________

b)

36_________________________________________

___________________________________________

c)

13_________________________________________

___________________________________________

d)

25_________________________________________

___________________________________________

Q5.Find the common factors of the following:

a. 12 and 36

__________________________________________

__________________________________________

__________________________________________

b 5 and 25

__________________________________________

Q6. Find the first 5 multiples of each of the following:

a. 9_____________________________________

b.11_____________________________________

c. 7______________________________________

d.6______________________________________

Q7. Find first three common multiples of.

a. 28 ,42_____________________________________

b.18 ,24______________________________________

Q8. Say whether the following are true or false.

a. 5 is multiple of 25.

b. 87 is multiple of 3.

c. 4 is a factor of 24.

d.7 is a factor of 83.

e. 1 is a factor of every number.

Please click the link below to download CBSE Class 4 Mathematics-Practise Assignment

**Click for more Mathematics Study Material**

**›**